MN HF1242 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Division action, to pass and return to
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Hennepin County; authority extended to impose a mortgage registry and deed tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hennepin County; authority extended to impose a mortgage registry and deed tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-29HouseDivision action, to pass and return to
2012-02-17HouseReferred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division
2012-01-30HouseMotion prevailed
2012-01-30HouseMotion to recall and re-refer to Taxes
2011-03-21HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback