MN HF1242 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Brandon's law established, and procedures implemented for investigating missing person cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brandon's law established, and procedures implemented for investigating missing person cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-07 Governor approval
2009-05-07 Governor's action Approval
2009-05-05 House: Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate
2009-05-05 House: Third reading as amended by the Senate
2009-05-05 House: Motion prevailed
2009-05-05 House: Motion to concur with Senate amendments
2009-05-05 House: Returned from Senate with amendment
2009-05-05 Senate: House concurred and repassed bill
2009-04-30 Senate: Special Order: Amended
2009-04-30 Senate: Third reading Passed
2009-04-25 House: Author added Murdock
2009-04-22 Senate: Second reading
2009-04-22 Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1146
2009-04-21 House: Authors added Sertich, Kiffmeyer, Torkelson, Downey, Dettmer and Mack
2009-04-21 Senate: Introduction and first reading
2009-04-21 Senate: Received from House
2009-04-21 Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration
2009-04-20 House: Authors added Doepke; Urdahl; Sanders; Anderson, P.; Loon; Scott; Shimanski; Howes and Abeler
2009-04-20 House: Bill was passed
2009-04-20 House: Third reading
2009-04-17 House: House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar 04/20/09
2009-04-16 House: Second reading
2009-04-16 House: Committee report, to pass as amended
2009-04-07 House: Author added Rukavina
2009-04-02 House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance
2009-03-30 House: Authors added Kelly and Sterner
2009-03-26 House: Author added Bigham
2009-03-18 House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2009-03-18 House: Referred by Chair to Public Safety Finance Division
2009-03-12 House: Author added Hosch
2009-03-09 House: Authors added Kelliher, Smith and Hilstrom
2009-03-02 House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Policy and Oversight

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback