MN HF1208 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Commission on Housing Affordability established.
Title
Legislative Commission on Housing Affordability established.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Carlson [D] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1294 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance