MN SF1294 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Legislative commission on housing affordability establishment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative commission on housing affordability establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
2019-03-11SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration
2019-03-04SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy
2019-02-18SenateAuthor added Housley
2019-02-14SenateReferred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2019-02-14SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1208 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Author added Lillie

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback