MN HF1201 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - House: Author added Bunn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - House: Author added Bunn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Council on Local Results and Innovation created, local governments encouraged to develop performance measurement programs, and money appropriated.
Title
Council on Local Results and Innovation created, local governments encouraged to develop performance measurement programs, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Bunn [D] | Rep. Denise Dittrich [D] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
Rep. Gene Pelowski [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Steve Simon [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | House: Author added Bunn | |
2009-03-12 | House: Author added Simon | |
2009-03-12 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes | |
2009-03-12 | House: Referred by Chair to Property and Local Sales Tax Division | |
2009-03-09 | House: Author added Slocum | |
2009-03-09 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections | |
2009-03-03 | House: Referred by Chair to Local Government Division | |
2009-03-02 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections |