MN HF1196 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Authors added Mortensen and Liebling
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Authors added Mortensen and Liebling
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Facial recognition technology acquisition and use by government entities prohibited.
Title
Facial recognition technology acquisition and use by government entities prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Authors added Mortensen and Liebling |
2021-04-27 | House | Author added Davnie |
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Christensen |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Hornstein and Bahr |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |