MN HF1183 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Considine
Pending: House Subcommittee on Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Considine
Pending: House Subcommittee on Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voting instructions and sample ballots required to be printed in languages other than English for designated precincts, and multilingual election judges required in certain precincts.
Title
Voting instructions and sample ballots required to be printed in languages other than English for designated precincts, and multilingual election judges required in certain precincts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Considine |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2235 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections