MN HF1160 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Authors added Dettmer and Pugh.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Authors added Dettmer and Pugh.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transit financial activity auditing and reporting required, and money appropriated.
Title
Transit financial activity auditing and reporting required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Sarah Anderson [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] |
Rep. Matthew Dean [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Authors added Dettmer and Pugh. |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1011 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Second reading