MN HF1053 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor veto
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor veto
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Public officials required to provide additional data to the secretary of state for use in maintaining the voter registration system, and automatic voter registration of applicants for a driver's license, instruction permit, or identification card provided.
Title
Public officials required to provide additional data to the secretary of state for use in maintaining the voter registration system, and automatic voter registration of applicants for a driver's license, instruction permit, or identification card provided.
Sponsors
Rep. John Benson [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Larry Howes [R] | Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] |
Rep. Jeremy Kalin [D] | Sen. Bev Scalze [D] | Rep. Steve Simon [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Governor veto | |
2009-05-21 | Governor's action Veto | |
2009-05-20 | Presentment date | |
2009-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-17 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate | |
2009-05-17 | House: Third reading as amended by the Senate | |
2009-05-17 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2009-05-17 | House: Motion to concur with Senate amendments | |
2009-05-17 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2009-05-17 | Senate: House concurred and repassed bill | |
2009-05-15 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. Calendar SF660 | |
2009-05-13 | House: Bill was passed | |
2009-05-13 | House: Third reading | |
2009-05-13 | House: Amendments offered | |
2009-05-13 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: Received from House | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2009-05-12 | House: Second reading | |
2009-05-12 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2009-05-12 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | |
2009-05-11 | House: Author added Scalze | |
2009-04-06 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance | |
2009-03-23 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2009-03-23 | House: Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division | |
2009-03-05 | House: Author added Kahn | |
2009-02-26 | House: Authors added Kalin and Benson | |
2009-02-23 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections |