MN HF10 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Author added Carlson
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clean Energy First Act established.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy First Act established.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseAuthor added Carlson
2021-02-04HouseAuthor added Hanson, J.
2021-01-25HouseAuthors added Hassan and Bernardy
2021-01-21HouseAuthor added Bahner
2021-01-11HouseAuthors added Frazier, Reyer, Acomb, Christensen
2021-01-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback