MI SJRH | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; assessments; taxable value; limit increase when market value decreases. Amends sec. 3, art. IX of the state constitution.
Title
Property tax; assessments; taxable value; limit increase when market value decreases. Amends sec. 3, art. IX of the state constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | |
2009-03-18 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-18 | Received On 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Adopted By 2/3 Vote Roll Call # 60 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-03-18 | Amendment(s) Defeated | |
2009-03-18 | Vote Reconsidered | |
2009-03-17 | Reconsider Vote Postponed | |
2009-03-17 | Defeated Roll Call # 57 Yeas 23 Nays 11 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed On Immediate Adoption | |
2009-03-17 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-03-17 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-17 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-03-17 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-17 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-17 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-02-03 | Referred To Committee On Finance |