MI SB1564 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0357'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0357'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; hazardous waste; treatment, storage, or disposal facility siting process; revise. Amends secs. 11102, 11107, 11118a, 11121, 11123, 11124, 11125, 11129, 11140 & 11153 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11102 et seq.) & repeals secs. 11116, 11117, 11118, 11119, 11120 & 11122 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11116 et seq.).
Title
Environmental protection; hazardous waste; treatment, storage, or disposal facility siting process; revise. Amends secs. 11102, 11107, 11118a, 11121, 11123, 11124, 11125, 11129, 11140 & 11153 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11102 et seq.) & repeals secs. 11116, 11117, 11118, 11119, 11120 & 11122 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11116 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0357'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2010 @ 1:56 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/22/2010 @ 1:12 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Presented To Governor 12/20/2010 @ 11:46 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-15 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-15 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-03 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-03 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-03 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 594 Yeas 92 Nays 2 | |
2010-12-03 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-03 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-03 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-03 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-12-01 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2010-11-10 | Read A First Time | |
2010-11-10 | Received On 11/10/2010 | |
2010-11-10 | Passed Roll Call # 565 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-10 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended | |
2010-11-10 | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In | |
2010-11-10 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-11-10 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-11-10 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-11-04 | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Environmental Affairs |