MI SB1369 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; other; option of community service in lieu of payment of driver responsibility fees; allow in certain circumstances. Amends sec. 732a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732a) & adds sec. 732b.
Title
Traffic control; other; option of community service in lieu of payment of driver responsibility fees; allow in certain circumstances. Amends sec. 732a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732a) & adds sec. 732b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 835 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2012 |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 835 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |