MI SB1351 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0624'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0624'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; reorganization; court of appeals and certain district court districts; reorganize. Amends secs. 302, 303a, 8123 & 8132 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.302 et seq.).
Title
Courts; reorganization; court of appeals and certain district court districts; reorganize. Amends secs. 302, 303a, 8123 & 8132 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.302 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1065 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 815 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 789 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 815 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 789 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0624'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 4:14 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:58 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:54 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 1065 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Title Amended |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 815 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-12 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2012 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 789 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |