MI SB1276 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation
Pending: House Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation
Pending: House Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; wildlife; designation of biodiversity areas; prohibit by DNR and remove biological diversity from list of state forest management goals. Amends secs. 504, 35101, 35501, 35502, 35503 & 52502 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.504 et seq.) & repeals secs. 35504 - 35506 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.35504 - 324.35506).
Title
Natural resources; wildlife; designation of biodiversity areas; prohibit by DNR and remove biological diversity from list of state forest management goals. Amends secs. 504, 35101, 35501, 35502, 35503 & 52502 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.504 et seq.) & repeals secs. 35504 - 35506 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.35504 - 324.35506).
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Casperson [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. Judith Emmons [R] | Sen. Arlan Meekhof [R] |
Sen. John Pappageorge [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 739 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Received On 11/08/2012 |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 739 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |