MI SB1267 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0263'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0263'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; underground storage tanks; environmental protection regulatory fee on refined petroleum products; extend sunset. Amends sec. 21550 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.21550).
Title
Environmental protection; underground storage tanks; environmental protection regulatory fee on refined petroleum products; extend sunset. Amends sec. 21550 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.21550).
Sponsors
Sen. Raymond Basham [D] | Sen. Patricia Birkholz [R] | Sen. Liz Brater [D] | Sen. Hansen Clarke [D] |
Sen. Tupac Hunter [D] | Sen. Gilda Jacobs [D] | Sen. Dennis Olshove [D] | Sen. Martha Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-09-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0263'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2010 @ 2:18 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/14/2010 @ 12:44 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/8/2010 @ 3:25 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-02 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-11-30 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-11-30 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-11-30 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 498 Yeas 57 Nays 44 | |
2010-11-30 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-11-30 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-30 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-11-30 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-09-16 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2010-09-16 | Read A First Time | |
2010-09-16 | Received On 09/16/2010 | |
2010-09-16 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 417 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-09-16 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-09-16 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-09-16 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-16 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-09-16 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-16 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-16 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-09-16 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-04-20 | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Environmental Affairs |