MI SB1225 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0482'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0482'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; public school employees; retirant performing custodial, food, or transportation services as an independent contractor at a reporting unit; allow without forfeiting retirement allowance. Amends sec. 61 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1361).
Title
Retirement; public school employees; retirant performing custodial, food, or transportation services as an independent contractor at a reporting unit; allow without forfeiting retirement allowance. Amends sec. 61 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1361).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 922 (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 714 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 714 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0482'18 |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 4:34 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/26/2018 @ 8:11 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2018 @ 3:16 Pm |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 922 Yeas 62 Nays 47 |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2018 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 714 Yeas 27 Nays 9 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mike Shirkey |