MI SB1179 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-18 - Referred To Committee On Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-18 - Referred To Committee On Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Food; service establishments; local government restaurant grading system for food service establishments; prohibit. Creates new act.
Title
Food; service establishments; local government restaurant grading system for food service establishments; prohibit. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 794 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Received On 12/18/2018 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 794 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |