MI SB1145 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Tourism And Outdoor Recreation
Pending: House Tourism And Outdoor Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Tourism And Outdoor Recreation
Pending: House Tourism And Outdoor Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; fishing; commercial fishing statute; update. Amends sec. 47305 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.47305) & repeals sec. 46701 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.46701).
Title
Natural resources; fishing; commercial fishing statute; update. Amends sec. 47305 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.47305) & repeals sec. 46701 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.46701).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 689 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | House | Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Tourism And Outdoor Recreation |
2018-12-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Received On 12/05/2018 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 689 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |