MI SB1141 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Recreation; state parks; recreation passport fee; designate as the "Senator Patty Birkholz recreation passport fee". Amends secs. 2001, 2045, 74101, 74116, 74120, 78101, 78105 & 78119 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.2001 et. seq.).
Title
Recreation; state parks; recreation passport fee; designate as the "Senator Patty Birkholz recreation passport fee". Amends secs. 2001, 2045, 74101, 74116, 74120, 78101, 78105 & 78119 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.2001 et. seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 659 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2018 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 659 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |