MI SB1102 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-29 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-29 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; other; foreclosure by advertisement; require notice of foreclosure to include information to mortgagor. Amends sec. 3212 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3212).
Title
Civil procedure; other; foreclosure by advertisement; require notice of foreclosure to include information to mortgagor. Amends sec. 3212 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3212).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 628 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 626 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 626 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 628 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2018-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2018 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 626 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |