MI SB1075 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; horse racing; miscellaneous changes to the horse racing law of 1995; enact. Amends title & secs. 2, 3, 4, 6, 7, 8, 9, 9a, 10, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 19a, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29 & 32 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.302 et seq.) & repeals secs. 5 & 35 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.305 & 431.335).
Title
Gaming; horse racing; miscellaneous changes to the horse racing law of 1995; enact. Amends title & secs. 2, 3, 4, 6, 7, 8, 9, 9a, 10, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 19a, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29 & 32 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.302 et seq.) & repeals secs. 5 & 35 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.305 & 431.335).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
HB5546 (Same As) 2012-12-31 - Pocket Veto 1/11/2013 @ 11:07 Am 2012 Addenda