MI HB5546 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Enrolled on December 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-31 - Pocket Veto 1/11/2013 @ 11:07 Am 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-31 - Pocket Veto 1/11/2013 @ 11:07 Am 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; horse racing; miscellaneous changes to the horse racing law of 1995; enact. Amends title & secs. 2, 3, 4, 6, 7, 8, 9, 9a, 10, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 19a, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29 & 32 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.302 et seq.) & repeals secs. 5 & 35 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.305 & 431.335).
Title
Gaming; horse racing; miscellaneous changes to the horse racing law of 1995; enact. Amends title & secs. 2, 3, 4, 6, 7, 8, 9, 9a, 10, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 19a, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29 & 32 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.302 et seq.) & repeals secs. 5 & 35 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.305 & 431.335).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1090 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 592 (Y: 91 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 592 (Y: 91 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Pocket Veto 1/11/2013 @ 11:07 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/28/2012 @ 11:06 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1090 Yeas 24 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2012-11-08 | House | Transmitted |
2012-11-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 592 Yeas 91 Nays 16 |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-08 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-04-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-04-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-04-24 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/20/2012 |
2012-04-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2012-04-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-04-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Daley |
Same As/Similar To
SB1075 (Same As) 2012-05-01 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1