MI SB1052 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0330'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0330'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education: financial aid; educational expenses eligible for payment in promise zones; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 2008 PA 549 (MCL 390.1663).
Title
Higher education: financial aid; educational expenses eligible for payment in promise zones; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 2008 PA 549 (MCL 390.1663).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 621 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 420 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 420 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0330'20 |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 03:12 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2020 11:24 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2020 12:56 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 621 Yeas 103 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-12-17 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-11-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-11-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-11-12 | House | Received On 11/12/2020 |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 420 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jon C. Bumstead |