MI SB1035 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; exemptions; real property of a sportsmen club that dedicates its facilities for charitable purposes for a certain period of time each tax year; exempt. Amends sec. 7o of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7o).
Title
Property tax; exemptions; real property of a sportsmen club that dedicates its facilities for charitable purposes for a certain period of time each tax year; exempt. Amends sec. 7o of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7o).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 630 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 630 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Tourism And Outdoor Recreation |
2018-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2018 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 630 Yeas 28 Nays 9 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |