MI SB1024 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0517'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0517'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; purchasing; Iran economic sanctions act; enact. Creates new act.
Title
State financing and management; purchasing; Iran economic sanctions act; enact. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Anderson [D] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] | Sen. John Brandenburg [R] | Sen. Michael Green [R] |
Sen. Roger Kahn [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1055 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 816 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 484 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 816 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 484 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0517'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 4:46 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2012 @ 9:17 Am |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:30 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 1055 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 816 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Services |
2012-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2012 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 484 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Substitute S-4 Adopted |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
Same As/Similar To
HB5479 (Same As) 2012-04-26 - Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions