MI SB0995 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-10)
Status: Passed on December 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0332'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-10)
Status: Passed on December 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0332'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; traffic regulation; autonomous driving; allow under certain conditions. Amends secs. 2b, 602b, 643, 643a & 665 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.2b et seq.); adds secs. 40c, 606b & 665a & repeals sec. 663 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.663).
Title
Traffic control; traffic regulation; autonomous driving; allow under certain conditions. Amends secs. 2b, 602b, 643, 643a & 665 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.2b et seq.); adds secs. 40c, 606b & 665a & repeals sec. 663 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.663).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 619 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 510 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 506 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 491 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-09-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 510 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 506 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 491 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-09-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-13 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0332'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/9/2016 @ 1:45 Pm |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/9/2016 @ 11:30 Am |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/29/2015 @ 4:58 Pm |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Roll Call # 619 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-11-10 | Senate | House Substitute H-4 Concurred In |
2016-11-10 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-11-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 510 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2016-11-10 | House | Vote Reconsidered |
2016-11-10 | House | Title Amended |
2016-11-10 | House | Passed Roll Call # 506 Yeas 104 Nays 2 |
2016-11-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-11-09 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted And Amended |
2016-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-09-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2016-09-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology |
2016-09-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-09-07 | House | Received On 09/07/2016 |
2016-09-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 491 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Kowall |