MI SB0991 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 0345'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health; other; experimental therapies for certain individuals; facilitate use. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; other; experimental therapies for certain individuals; facilitate use. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 515 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 532 (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-10-22SenateAssigned Pa 0345'14 With Immediate Effect
2014-10-22SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 10/17/2014 @ 2:25 Pm
2014-10-22SenateApproved By Governor 10/15/2014 @ 12:10 Pm
2014-10-22SenatePresented To Governor 10/7/2014 @ 3:22 Pm
2014-10-02SenateOrdered Enrolled
2014-10-02SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2014-10-01HouseReturned To Senate
2014-10-01HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 515 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2014-10-01HouseRead A Third Time
2014-09-17HousePlaced On Third Reading
2014-09-17HouseRead A Second Time
2014-09-16HouseReferred To Second Reading
2014-09-16HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2014-08-27HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2014-08-27HouseRead A First Time
2014-08-27HouseReceived On 08/13/2014
2014-08-13SenatePassed Roll Call # 532 Yeas 31 Nays 2 Excused 5 Not Voting 0
2014-08-13SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2014-08-13SenateRules Suspended
2014-08-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3
2014-08-13SenateSubstitute S-3 Concurred In
2014-08-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3
2014-08-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2014-08-13SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2014-08-13SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2014-06-11SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2014-06-11SenateIntroduced By Senator John Pappageorge

Same As/Similar To

HB5651 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - Printed Bill Filed 06/12/2014

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2014-SB-0991
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2014-SIB-0991.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2014-SEBS-0991.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2014-SEBH-0991.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2014-SNB-0991.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/publicact/htm/2014-PA-0345.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-08-13-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-09-16-066.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-10-01-072.htm

Bill Comments 750

feedback