MI SB0972 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0416'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0416'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; guidelines for violation of skilled trades regulation act; create. Amends sec. 13p, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13p).
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; guidelines for violation of skilled trades regulation act; create. Amends sec. 13p, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13p).
Sponsors
Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] | Sen. Marty Knollenberg [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Sen. Peter MacGregor [R] |
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 646 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 603 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 603 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0416'16 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/4/2017 @ 11:20 Am 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/3/2017 @ 7:38 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2016 @ 3:44 Pm |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-13 | House | Passed Roll Call # 646 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2016-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-11-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2016-11-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-11-09 | House | Received On 10/20/2016 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 603 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tonya Schuitmaker |
Subjects
Construction: inspectors
Construction: occupations
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Construction: occupations
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs