MI SB0972 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0482'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0482'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; payment and collection; tax bills; require to include past due amounts owed. Amends sec. 44 of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.44).
Title
Property tax; payment and collection; tax bills; require to include past due amounts owed. Amends sec. 44 of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.44).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 872 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 709 (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 436 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 709 (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 436 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0482'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:08 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/27/2012 @ 9:25 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 10:10 Am |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-12 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 872 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-11 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-06 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 709 Yeas 67 Nays 42 |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Amended |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-06-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2012-06-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-06-06 | House | Received On 06/05/2012 |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 436 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |