MI SB0967 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0390'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0390'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; other; state rights-of-way on state roads; allow dedication of lanes for public transit. Amends sec. 1 of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0909'12
Title
Transportation; other; state rights-of-way on state roads; allow dedication of lanes for public transit. Amends sec. 1 of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0909'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 893 (Y: 56 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 749 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 749 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0390'12 |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2012 @ 5:36 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/19/2012 @ 12:50 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/19/2012 @ 12:02 Pm |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Enrollment Vacated |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 893 Yeas 56 Nays 49 |
2012-12-06 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2012-11-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Received On 11/27/2012 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 749 Yeas 23 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |