MI SB0919 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology
Pending: House Communications And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology
Pending: House Communications And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Aeronautics; unmanned aerial systems; criminal responsibility for use of unmanned aerial vehicle; define as an extension of the person. Amends 2016 PA 436 (MCL 259.301 - 259.331) by adding sec. 20.
Title
Aeronautics; unmanned aerial systems; criminal responsibility for use of unmanned aerial vehicle; define as an extension of the person. Amends 2016 PA 436 (MCL 259.301 - 259.331) by adding sec. 20.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 581 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology |
2018-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-09-27 | House | Received On 09/27/2018 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 581 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |