MI SB0916 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 329'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Occupations; junk and secondhand dealers; automatic recycling kiosks; regulate. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3, 4 & 5 of 1917 PA 350 (MCL 445.401 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupations; junk and secondhand dealers; automatic recycling kiosks; regulate. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3, 4 & 5 of 1917 PA 350 (MCL 445.401 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 473 (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 244 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05SenateAssigned Pa 329'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-09-05SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 7/2/2018 @ 1:08 Pm
2018-09-05SenateApproved By Governor 6/28/2018 @ 6:34 Am
2018-07-25SenatePresented To Governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:34 Pm
2018-06-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-12SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-06-12HouseReturned To Senate
2018-06-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 473 Yeas 98 Nays 11
2018-06-12HouseRead A Third Time
2018-06-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-06-07HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-29HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-29HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-05-02HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
2018-05-02HouseRead A First Time
2018-05-02HouseReceived On 05/02/2018
2018-05-02SenatePassed Roll Call # 244 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-05-01SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-05-01SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-04-26SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-04-26SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-03-21SenateReferred To Committee On Commerce
2018-03-21SenateIntroduced By Senator Michael Kowall

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-SB-0916
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2018-SIB-0916.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2018-SEBS-0916.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2018-SEBH-0916.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2018-SNB-0916.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0329.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-04-26-041.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-02-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-29-054.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-06-12-059.htm

Bill Comments

feedback