MI SB0910 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Education Reform
Pending: House Education Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Education Reform
Pending: House Education Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School aid; other; requirement to employ certificated teachers for the purposes of school aid; modify. Amends secs. 6 & 163 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606 & 388.1763). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0909'18
Title
School aid; other; requirement to employ certificated teachers for the purposes of school aid; modify. Amends secs. 6 & 163 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606 & 388.1763). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0909'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 517 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 517 Yeas 24 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Marty Knollenberg |