MI SB0888 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Assigned Pa 0149'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Assigned Pa 0149'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; agriculture; administration of farm produce insurance program; authorize collection of fee from producers for state enforcement costs and revise fund investment requirements. Amends title & secs. 3, 7, 8, 9, 11, 13, 15 & 21 of 2003 PA 198 (MCL 285.313 et seq.) & adds sec. 10.
Title
Occupations; agriculture; administration of farm produce insurance program; authorize collection of fee from producers for state enforcement costs and revise fund investment requirements. Amends title & secs. 3, 7, 8, 9, 11, 13, 15 & 21 of 2003 PA 198 (MCL 285.313 et seq.) & adds sec. 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 (Y: 71 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 139 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 139 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0149'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/30/2012 @ 1:14 Pm |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/30/2012 @ 11:24 Am |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/21/2012 @ 3:24 Pm |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-05-15 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-10 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-05-10 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 Yeas 71 Nays 35 |
2012-05-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-03-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-03-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-03-15 | House | Received On 03/15/2012 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 139 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
Subjects
Agriculture, products
Businesses, other
Occupations, agriculture
State agencies (existing), agriculture and rural development
Businesses, other
Occupations, agriculture
State agencies (existing), agriculture and rural development