MI SB0881 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
Pending: House Local Government And Municipal Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
Pending: House Local Government And Municipal Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: exemptions; retroactive application of poverty exemption; provide for. Amends secs. 7u & 53b of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7u & 211.53b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0808'22, SB 0809'22
Title
Property tax: exemptions; retroactive application of poverty exemption; provide for. Amends secs. 7u & 53b of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7u & 211.53b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0808'22, SB 0809'22
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 345 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2022-06-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-28 | House | Received On 06/23/2022 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 345 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Stephanie Chang |