MI SB0871 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0182'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0182'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; statute of limitations; statute of limitations for certain criminal sexual conduct violations; modify. Amends sec. 24, ch. VII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 767.24).
Title
Criminal procedure; statute of limitations; statute of limitations for certain criminal sexual conduct violations; modify. Amends sec. 24, ch. VII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 767.24).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 360 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 147 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 147 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0182'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/12/2018 @ 4:22 Pm |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/12/2018 @ 4:08 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/8/2018 @ 10:05 Am |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Roll Call # 360 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2018-05-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-05-24 | House | Title Amended |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-24 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-03-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-03-15 | House | Received On 03/15/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 147 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |