MI SB0859 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0552'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0552'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; other; sale of portable electronics insurance; exempt from requirements for licensing of producers. Amends sec. 1202 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1202).
Title
Insurance; other; sale of portable electronics insurance; exempt from requirements for licensing of producers. Amends sec. 1202 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1202).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1079 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 869 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 445 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 869 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 445 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0552'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 4:58 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 3:59 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:58 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 1079 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Amended Title |
2012-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-14 | House | Title Amended |
2012-12-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 869 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-14 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-06-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-06-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-06-06 | House | Received On 06/06/2012 |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 445 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |