MI SB0834 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-17 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-17 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement: funds; public safety officer death benefits; increase. Amends sec. 4 of 2004 PA 46 (MCL 28.634).
Title
Law enforcement: funds; public safety officer death benefits; increase. Amends sec. 4 of 2004 PA 46 (MCL 28.634).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 333 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2024-09-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-09-17 | House | Received On 09/17/2024 |
2024-09-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 333 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2024-09-17 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Adopted |
2024-09-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-09-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-09-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-09-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel |
Subjects
Law enforcement: funds
Law enforcement: local police
Law enforcement: state police
Public employees and officers: compensation and benefits
Law enforcement: local police
Law enforcement: state police
Public employees and officers: compensation and benefits