MI SB0783 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Tobacco: other; prohibiting flavored vaping products and marketing strategies; codify. Amends 1915 PA 31 (MCL 722.641 - 722.645) by adding sec. 1a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0781'20, SB 0782'20, SB 0784'20

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco: other; prohibiting flavored vaping products and marketing strategies; codify. Amends 1915 PA 31 (MCL 722.641 - 722.645) by adding sec. 1a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0781'20, SB 0782'20, SB 0784'20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 201 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2020-06-17HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-06-17HouseRead A First Time
2020-06-17HouseReceived On 06/17/2020
2020-06-17SenatePassed Roll Call # 201 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-06-17SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-06-17SenateRules Suspended
2020-06-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2020-06-17SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-06-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-06-17SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-06-17SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-06-17SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-02-05SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-02-05SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Runestad

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback