MI SB0757 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Assigned Pa 0177'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Elections: election officials; certain city and township clerks opening absent voter ballot return envelopes on the day before election day; authorize, allow precinct election inspectors to work in shifts, require notice to electors for mismatched or missing signatures on an absent voter ballot application or return envelope, and provide requirements for absent voter ballot drop boxes. Amends secs. 759, 761, 764a, 765, 765a & 765b of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759 et seq.) & adds secs. 14b, 24k & 761d.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: election officials; certain city and township clerks opening absent voter ballot return envelopes on the day before election day; authorize, allow precinct election inspectors to work in shifts, require notice to electors for mismatched or missing signatures on an absent voter ballot application or return envelope, and provide requirements for absent voter ballot drop boxes. Amends secs. 759, 761, 764a, 765, 765a & 765b of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759 et seq.) & adds secs. 14b, 24k & 761d.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 348 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 421 (Y: 94 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-7 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 297 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-07SenateAssigned Pa 0177'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-10-07SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 10/06/2020 02:08 Pm
2020-10-07SenateApproved By Governor 10/06/2020 01:30 Pm
2020-10-06SenatePresented To Governor 10/05/2020 03:40 Pm
2020-09-24SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-09-24SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2020-09-24SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-09-24SenateHouse Substitute (h-7) Concurred In
2020-09-24SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 348 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-09-24HouseReturned To Senate
2020-09-24HouseTitle Amended
2020-09-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 421 Yeas 94 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2020-09-24HouseRead A Third Time
2020-09-24HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-09-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-09-24HouseSubstitute (h-7) Adopted
2020-09-24HouseRead A Second Time
2020-09-24HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-09-24HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-7)
2020-09-23HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
2020-09-15HouseReferred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
2020-09-15HouseRead A First Time
2020-09-15HouseReceived On 09/15/2020
2020-09-15SenatePassed Roll Call # 297 Yeas 34 Nays 2 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2020-09-15SenateSubstitute (s-6) Adopted
2020-05-27SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-4)
2020-05-27SenateSubstitute (s-4) Concurred In
2020-05-27SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-4)
2020-02-18SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-02-18SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-02-18SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-01-28SenateReferred To Committee On Elections
2020-01-28SenateIntroduced By Senator Ruth A. Johnson

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-SB-0757
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2020-SIB-0757.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBS-0757.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBH-0757.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2020-SNB-0757.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0177.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-02-18-017.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-15-069.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-09-24-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-24-073.htm

Bill Comments

feedback