MI SB0744 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - Assigned Pa 0159'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - Assigned Pa 0159'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation: funds; maritime and port facility assistance fund and grant program; create. Creates new act.
Title
Transportation: funds; maritime and port facility assistance fund and grant program; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 (Y: 94 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 313 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 313 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0159'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2022 12:18 Pm |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/19/2022 09:56 Am |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/11/2022 01:52 Pm |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2022-07-01 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-07-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 Yeas 94 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-07-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-07-01 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-07-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-07-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-06-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2022-06-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-15 | House | Received On 06/15/2022 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 313 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Stephanie Chang |
Subjects
Local government: port authorities
Natural resources: Great Lakes
State agencies (existing): transportation
Transportation: funds
Natural resources: Great Lakes
State agencies (existing): transportation
Transportation: funds