MI SB0727 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 0106'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 0106'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; teachers; interim teaching certificate; modify certain criteria. Amends sec. 1531i of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1531i).
Title
Education; teachers; interim teaching certificate; modify certain criteria. Amends sec. 1531i of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1531i).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 174 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 51 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 51 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0106'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/5/2018 @ 2:58 Pm |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved By Governor 4/5/2018 @ 8:54 Am |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/30/2018 @ 11:43 Am |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Roll Call # 174 Yeas 24 Nays 10 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2018-03-21 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 Yeas 85 Nays 23 |
2018-03-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-20 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-03-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2018-01-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-31 | House | Received On 01/31/2018 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 51 Yeas 24 Nays 13 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Phillip Pavlov |