MI SB0671 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health facilities; certificate of need; certificate of need commission; modify members, and modify members of advisory committees appointed by the commission. Amends secs. 22211 & 22215 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.22211 & 333.22215).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health facilities; certificate of need; certificate of need commission; modify members, and modify members of advisory committees appointed by the commission. Amends secs. 22211 & 22215 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.22211 & 333.22215).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 84 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2020-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2020-02-26HouseReceived On 02/26/2020
2020-02-26SenatePassed Roll Call # 84 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-02-25SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2020-02-25SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-02-25SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-02-25SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-02-25SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-02-25SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-12-04SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2019-12-04SenateIntroduced By Senator Lana Theis

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback