MI SB0660 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Vetoed By Governor 12/21/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Vetoed By Governor 12/21/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Agriculture; other; animal care standards for egg-laying hens; delay effective date and provide for enforcement. Amends sec. 46 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.746) & adds sec. 47.
Title
Agriculture; other; animal care standards for egg-laying hens; delay effective date and provide for enforcement. Amends sec. 46 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.746) & adds sec. 47.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 700 (Y: 79 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 46 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 46 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 12/21/2018 |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/10/2018 @ 11:48 Am |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-05 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-05 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 700 Yeas 79 Nays 29 |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2018-01-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-31 | House | Received On 01/31/2018 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 46 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Arlan Meekhof |