MI SB0649 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-21 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-21 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; occupations; procedures for informed consent for human in vitro fertilization services; establish, and require certain reports. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 2694 & 2695.
Title
Health; occupations; procedures for informed consent for human in vitro fertilization services; establish, and require certain reports. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 2694 & 2695.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | |
2010-04-21 | Read A First Time | |
2010-04-21 | Received On 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Passed Roll Call # 198 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-04-21 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-04-21 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 As Amended | |
2010-04-21 | Substitute S-3 As Amended Concurred In | |
2010-04-21 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 And Amendment(s) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 | |
2010-01-26 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-01-26 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 | |
2009-06-18 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
Subjects
Health facilities, other
Health, occupations
Health, research
State agencies (existing), community health
Health, occupations
Health, research
State agencies (existing), community health