MI SB0638 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 0091'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 0091'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; reinsurance; eligibility credit for reinsurance; modify. Amends secs. 1103 & 1105 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1103 & 500.1105) & adds sec. 1106.
Title
Insurance; reinsurance; eligibility credit for reinsurance; modify. Amends secs. 1103 & 1105 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1103 & 500.1105) & adds sec. 1106.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 126 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 482 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 482 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0091'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/26/2018 @ 3:10 Pm |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:12 Pm |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/14/2018 @ 2:04 Pm |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Roll Call # 126 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2018-03-01 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2017-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2017 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 482 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |