MI SB0615 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-17 - Assigned Pa 0015'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-17 - Assigned Pa 0015'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; remedies; judgments against municipalities that are collected as tax levies; prohibit transmission or capturing by other governmental entity. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 6094a.
Title
Civil procedure; remedies; judgments against municipalities that are collected as tax levies; prohibit transmission or capturing by other governmental entity. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 6094a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 26 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 579 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 579 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0015'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/16/2016 @ 2:52 Pm |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 2/16/2016 @ 8:30 Am |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Presented To Governor 2/8/2016 @ 11:05 Am |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-02-03 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-02-03 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-02-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 26 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2016-02-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-02-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-02-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-12-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-12-10 | House | Received On 12/10/2015 |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 579 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |