MI SB0603 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health: diseases; issuing emergency orders requiring students to wear a mask, receive emergency use authorization vaccination, or be tested for certain diseases to attend school, participate in school sanctioned activities, or ride the bus; prohibit. Amends secs. 2253 & 2453 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2253 & 333.2453). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0601'21
Title
Health: diseases; issuing emergency orders requiring students to wear a mask, receive emergency use authorization vaccination, or be tested for certain diseases to attend school, participate in school sanctioned activities, or ride the bus; prohibit. Amends secs. 2253 & 2453 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2253 & 333.2453). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0601'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 408 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 408 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2021-10-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-26 | House | Received On 10/26/2021 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 408 Yeas 19 Nays 15 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kimberly A. Lasata |
Subjects
Health: diseases
Health: immunizations
Health: local health departments
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health: immunizations
Health: local health departments
State agencies (existing): health and human services