MI SB0592 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 0088'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Villages; home rule; computation of net indebtedness; modify to include eligible reimbursements under the local community stabilization authority act. Amends sec. 26 of 1909 PA 278 (MCL 78.26).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Villages; home rule; computation of net indebtedness; modify to include eligible reimbursements under the local community stabilization authority act. Amends sec. 26 of 1909 PA 278 (MCL 78.26).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 160 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 536 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateAssigned Pa 0088'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-10SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 3/26/2018 @ 3:04 Pm
2018-04-10SenateApproved By Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:30 Pm
2018-03-20SenatePresented To Governor 3/19/2018 @ 2:12 Pm
2018-03-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-03-14SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-03-14SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-03-13HouseReturned To Senate
2018-03-13HouseInserted Full Title
2018-03-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 160 Yeas 106 Nays 3
2018-03-13HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-08HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-08HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-28HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-28HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-12-13HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government
2017-12-13HouseRead A First Time
2017-12-13HouseReceived On 12/13/2017
2017-12-13SenatePassed Roll Call # 536 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2017-12-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-12-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-10-05SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-10-05SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-10-05SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-09-27SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2017-09-27SenateIntroduced By Senator Mike Shirkey

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0592
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0592.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0592.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0592.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0592.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0088.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-10-05-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-13-102.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-28-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-13-027.htm

Bill Comments

feedback